IL HB2792 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery, on or before the last day of each fiscal year, to deposit any estimated remaining proceeds (rather than any remaining proceeds), after certain payments and transfers are made, into the Capital Projects Fund. Provides that the Department shall increase or decrease its deposit into the Capital Projects Fund each year by the amount that the actual expenditures either fell short of or exceeded the estimate used by the Department in making the deposit for the previous fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-CAPITAL PROJECTS FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2792&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2792.htm |