IL HB2782 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Employment and Economic Opportunity for Persons with Disabilities Task Force Act. Provides that the Employment and Economic Opportunity for Persons with Disabilities Task Force shall operate with administrative support from the Illinois Department of Human Services (currently, the Department of Employment Security). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ECON TASK FORCE ADMIN SUPPORT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20409510Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback