IL HB2777 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the General Assembly Redistricting Act of 2021. Redistricts the Legislative Districts (for election of Senators) and the Representative Districts (for election of Representatives). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CEMETERY OVERSIGHT-SUNSET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 71 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0010
2021-06-04HouseEffective Date June 4, 2021
2021-06-04HouseGovernor Approved
2021-05-30HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-28HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-28HouseHouse Concurs
2021-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 071-045-000
2021-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2021-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-28HouseArrived in House
2021-05-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-018-000
2021-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2021-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2021-05-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-05-28SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2021-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Redistricting; 008-004-000
2021-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Redistricting
2021-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021
2021-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021
2021-05-13SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2021-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-007-000
2021-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-03-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5804.32Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.40Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2777&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2777.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2777eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2777enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/102/102-0010.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2777ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2777ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2777ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2777ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2777sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB2777_04222021_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200HB2777_05282021_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB2777sam001_05282021_008000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback