IL HB2764 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources Act. Provides that only materials manufactured in Illinois may be sold on the property of the Illinois State Museum. Defines "materials manufactured in Illinois". Amends the State Parks Act. Provides that only materials manufactured in Illinois may be sold in gift shops or concession areas within State parks or parkways. Defines "materials manufactured in Illinois". Amends the Historic Preservation Agency Act. Provides that only materials manufactured in Illinois may be sold on the property of State Historic Sites, State Memorials, and the other properties over which the Historic Preservation Agency has jurisdiction. Defines "materials manufactured in Illinois".
Title
GOODS SOLD IN THE STATE MUSEUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 23, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 073-040-001 |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-04-27 | House | Motion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-04-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-04-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-04-06 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-31 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-012-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3405 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 801 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 835 | 4d | New Code | See Bill Text |