IL HB2762 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Lowers the compulsory school age from 7 years to 6 years; makes a related change. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
SCH CD-LOWER COMPULSORY AGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-036-000 |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-03-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 009-002-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-03-12 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 26-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |