IL HB2759 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if a person who first becomes a member or participant of a retirement system or pension fund under the Code on or after January 1, 2018 (i) is receiving a retirement annuity or retirement pension under that system or fund and (ii) becomes a member or participant under any other system or fund created by the Code based on full-time employment, then that retirement annuity or retirement pension shall be suspended during that employment. Upon termination of that employment, the person's retirement annuity or retirement pension payments shall resume and may be recalculated if recalculation is provided for under the applicable Article of the Code. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-RETURN TO EMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2759&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2759.htm |