IL HB2756 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Changes the application of provisions concerning allowing management and mitigation of the effects of urbanization on stormwater drainage in metropolitan counties located in the area served by the Northeastern Illinois Planning Commission to those located in the area served by the Chicago Metropolitan Agency for Planning. Authorizes all counties (currently, only specified counties) to adopt stormwater management plans. Provides that counties' minimum standards for floodplain and stormwater management should have an emphasis on the use of cost effective, nature-based solutions and provides examples of such solutions. Provides that the stormwater management plans shall evaluate water quality and flooding problems caused by urban flooding. Defines "urban flooding" as the flooding of public and private land in urban areas that results from stormwater or snowmelt runoff overwhelming the existing drainage infrastructure, unrelated to the overflow of any river or lake, whether or not that land is located in or near a floodplain. Provides that a stormwater management planning committee may make grants to units of local government and landowners under specified conditions.
Title
COUNTY STORMWATER MANAGEMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-011-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1062.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |