IL HB2755 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Innovations for Transportation Infrastructure Act. Provides that the Department of Transportation may use design-build project delivery methods, Construction Manager/General Contractor project delivery methods, or Alternative Technical Concepts for design-bid-build project delivery of transportation facilities, provided that the delivery method does not exceed 20% of the Department's multi-year highway improvement program, with no one year exceeding 30%. Provides that the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority may use design-build project delivery methods, Construction Manager/General Contractor project delivery methods, or Alternative Technical Concepts for design-bid-build project delivery of transportation facilities if the facilities delivered do not exceed 20% of the Authority's annual improvement program. Places limits on the number of projects that the Department may use the various methods on. Provides that during the first phase of the two-phase procurement, the Transportation Agency (Department of Transportation or the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority) shall not consider price proposals to make its short-list decision. Provides that at least half of the evaluation committee used to assist in selecting design-build and Construction Manager/General Contractor contracts shall consist of licensed design professionals. Provides the Architectural, Engineering, and Land Surveying Qualifications Based Selection Act does not apply to procurements under the new Act. Contains provisions concerning the procurement process and terms of design-build and construction manager-general contractor contracts. Provides that the Transportation Agency has eminent domain and quick take powers under the Act. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code and the Public Construction Bond Act. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
INFRASTRUCTURE DESIGN BUILD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Re-assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3501 | 825-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 1-10.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 550 | 1.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 570 | 2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 575 | 2.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 10 | 11.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 30 | 15-5-48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2755&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2755.htm |