IL HB2753 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Lake Michigan Wind Energy Act. Requires the Department of Natural Resources to develop a detailed offshore wind energy siting matrix for the public trust lands of Lake Michigan. Authorizes the Department, after finalizing the offshore wind energy siting matrix, to grant offshore wind energy development site assessment permits and leases. Authorizes the Department to convert site assessment leases to construction and operation leases. Grants the Department other rulemaking powers. Creates the Offshore Wind Energy Economic Development Policy Task Force. Charges the Task Force with analyzing and evaluating policy and economic options to facilitate the development of offshore wind energy and proposing an appropriate Illinois mechanism for purchasing and selling power from offshore wind energy projects. Effective immediately.
Title
LAKE MICHIGAN WIND ENERGY ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0447 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2013 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-010-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-002 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Biss |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Energy; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Energy; 012-000-003 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Energy |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-021-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2013-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 013-002-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |