IL HB2746 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the exemption for graphic arts machinery and equipment applies for all periods on and after September 1, 2004. Provides that the exemption includes production related tangible personal property beginning on July 1, 2014. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2014, the manufacturing and assembly exemption also includes production related tangible personal property. Makes changes to the definition of "production related tangible personal property". Provides that the graphic arts exemption and the manufacturing and assembly exemption are each exempt from the Acts' automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-GRAPHIC ARTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2746&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2746.htm |