IL HB2732 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that Exceptional Quality biosolids shall not be subject to regulation as a sludge or other waste, except as provided in the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004 in relation to the authority of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency, if specified requirements are met. Provides that nothing in the Act shall limit or supersede the authority of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency under the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EXCEPTIONAL QUALITY BIOSOLIDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0128
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date August 18, 2017
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2017
2017-05-05SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-004-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 020-000-000
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415522.56aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback