IL HB2723 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. In provisions concerning change of name, provides that a person interested in the matter shall make known any objection to the granting of the petition for change of name by filing a written objection stating the reasons for the objection with the court at least 2 court days before the matter is scheduled to be heard and by appearing in court at the hearing to show cause why the petition for change of name should not be granted. Provides that if no written objection is timely filed, the court may grant the petition. Deletes language restricting or prohibiting the filing of a petition for change of name by persons convicted of certain crimes. Provides instead that if the petitioner has been convicted of identity theft, aggravated identity theft, felony or misdemeanor criminal sexual abuse when the victim of the offense at the time of its commission is under 18 years of age, felony or misdemeanor sexual exploitation of a child, felony or misdemeanor indecent solicitation of a child, felony or misdemeanor indecent solicitation of an adult, or any other offense for which a person is required to register under the Sex Offender Registration Act in this State or any other state, and the petitioner has not been pardoned, the clerk shall notify the Illinois State Police so that they may have the opportunity to file a timely objection to the petition for change of name. Provides that the court may waive specified publication requirements and order that the record of the proceeding be designated confidential if the court finds good cause for entering such an order, including evidence that publication or availability of a record of the proceeding will place the petitioner or another individual in physical danger and evidence that the petitioner or another individual has been the victim of stalking or assaultive behavior.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-NAME CHANGE; FELONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-24SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-19SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-034-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-24HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735521-101Amended CodeCitation Text
735521-103Amended CodeCitation Text
735521-103.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback