IL HB2719 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Radon Industry Licensing Act. Abolishes the Task Force on Radon-Resistant Building Codes. Make a corresponding change in the Radon Resistant Construction Act.
Title
RADON TASK FORCE-ABOLISH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0126 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 44 | 28 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
420 | 52 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |