IL HB2718 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Provides that rates for homemaker services shall be increased to $29.64 beginning July 1, 2023 to sustain a minimum wage of $18 per hour for direct service workers. Requires rates in subsequent State fiscal years to be no lower than the rates in effect on July 1, 2023. Requires providers of in-home services to be required to certify to the Department on Aging that they remain in compliance with the mandated wage increase for direct service workers. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, paid time off and payment for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation, shall not be reduced in relation to the rate increases described in the amendatory Act. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
AGING-HOMEMAKER WAGE INCREASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2023-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2023-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-04-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-04-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-04-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-04-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-04-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-04-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-04-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-04-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2718&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2718.htm |