IL HB2713 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Uniform Partnership Act (1997). Establishes fees for certain expedited services and provides that the fees collected for those services shall be deposited into the Division of Corporations Registered Limited Liability Partnership Fund (the Fund) to the credit of an account within the Fund. Specifies uses for the moneys in the account. Provides that the balance in the Fund at the end of any fiscal year shall not exceed $600,000 and any amount in excess of $600,000 shall be transferred to the General Revenue Fund, and deletes existing language regarding transfers from the Fund to the General Revenue Fund. Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Prohibits a limited liability company from using the name of a domestic corporation that has been administratively dissolved until 3 years have elapsed following the date of issuance of the certificate of dissolution. In a provision requiring corporations to submit an annual report to the Secretary of State concerning the aggregate number of shares the corporation has authority to issue, provides that, in the case of a corporation which has established an extended filing month, the information shall be given in a specified manner. Repeals a Section of the Limited Liability Company Act providing that a limited liability company that provides or intends to provide professional services requiring individuals engaged in the profession to be licensed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall not open, operate, or maintain an establishment for a purpose for which a limited liability company may be organized under the Act without obtaining a certificate of registration under the Professional Limited Liability Company Act. Effective July 1, 2017, except certain provisions take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOS-BUS CORP-EXPEDITED SERVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 098-000-000
2017-06-25HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-23HouseArrived in House
2017-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham
2017-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-000
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-001-000
2017-03-08HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-08HouseRecommends Do Pass as Amended Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 To Commercial Law Subcommittee
2017-02-24HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8051801-28Repealed CodeCitation Text
805206108Amended CodeCitation Text
8052061209New CodeSee Bill Text
805512.43Amended CodeCitation Text
805514.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2713&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2713.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2713eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2713enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2713ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2713sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2713sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2713_03152017_033000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2713_05232017_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2713_06252017_007001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2713_06252017_007000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback