IL HB2707 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. In the 5 State-funded retirement systems, provides that a change in actuarial assumptions that increases or decreases the required State contribution, including a change in assumed investment returns or mortality rates, that first applies in State fiscal year 2016 or thereafter, shall be implemented in equal annual amounts over a 5-year period beginning in the State fiscal year in which the actuarial change first applies or fiscal year 2018, whichever is later. Requires each board and the State Actuary to recalculate and recertify the amount of the State contribution for State fiscal year 2018, taking into account the changes made by the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-STATE SYS-FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-135.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 18-131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 18-140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |