IL HB2702 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Podiatric Medical Practice Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-25 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-24HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-25HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 099-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-001
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-001
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-001
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-001-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-23HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-21HouseRe-assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2251002Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2702&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2702.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2702eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2702enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2702ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2702ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2702sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2702_04282017_054000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2702_05262017_033000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2702_06252017_006000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback