IL HB2696 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Provides that each member of a common interest community association shall receive through a prescribed delivery method, at least 25 (instead of 30) days but not more than 60 days prior to the adoption by the board, a copy of the proposed annual budget. Makes a similar change in the Condominium Property Act. Further amends the Condominium Property Act. Replaces language specifying when a portion of a noticed board meeting may be closed with language providing that the board may close any portion of a noticed meeting or meet separately from a noticed meeting to: (A) discuss litigation when an action against or on behalf of the particular association has been filed and is pending in a court or administrative tribunal, or when the board of managers finds that such an action is probable or imminent; (B) discuss the appointment, employment, engagement, or dismissal of an employee, independent contractor, agent, or other provider of goods and services; (C) interview a potential employee, independent contractor, agent, or other provider of goods and services; (D) discuss violations of rules and regulations of the association; (E) discuss a unit owner's unpaid share of common expenses; or (F) consult with the association's legal counsel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONDO/CICAA: BUDGETS; MEETINGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7651601-45Amended CodeCitation Text
76560518.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback