IL HB2694 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. In provisions concerning transition of services, provides that the health care plan shall not modify an enrollee's coverage of a drug during the plan year if the drug has been previously approved for coverage by the plan for a medical condition, the plan's prescribing provider continues to prescribe the drug for the medical condition, and the patient continues to be an enrollee of the health care plan. Provides specific prohibited modifications of drug coverage in the health plan. Provides that the provisions do not prohibit a health care plan from requiring a pharmacist to effect generic substitutions of prescription drugs. Provides that the provisions do not prohibit the addition of prescription drugs to a health care plan's list of covered drugs during the coverage year. Effective immediately.
Title
PATIENT RIGHTS-TRANSITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 134 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2694&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2694.htm |