IL HB2694 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Provides that certain moneys in the State Gaming Fund shall be transferred (rather than paid) to the Horse Racing Equity Fund and Chicago State University. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMING FUND-TRANSFERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-03HouseSession Sine Die
2013-03-12HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2013-03-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2013-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2013-02-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-02-21HouseFirst Reading
2013-02-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2301013Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback