IL HB2687 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that, in each fiscal year (instead of Fiscal Year 2013 only), the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall require that any convention and tourism bureau receiving a grant under this Section that requires matching funds shall provide matching funds equal to no less than 50% of the grant amount. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-CONVENTION AND TOURISM
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0252 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 46.6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 46.6d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-707 | Amended Code | Citation Text |