IL HB2686 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits gambling when he or she knowingly establishes, maintains, operates, or offers an Internet site, smartphone application, or other similar electronic or digital media or communication technology that permits a person to play a game of chance or skill for money or other thing of value by means of the Internet, smartphone application, or other similar electronic or digital media or communication technology or to make a wager upon the result of any game, contest, political nomination, appointment, or election by means of the Internet, smartphone application, or other similar electronic or digital media or communication technology, or knowingly establishes, maintains, or operates a fantasy sports contest that permits a person to play the contest for money or other thing of value. This provision does not apply to season-long fantasy sports contests. Provides that a violation is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense. Defines "fantasy sports contest", "season-long fantasy sports contest", and "smartphone".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-GAMBLING-FANTASY SPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseTo Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720528-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback