IL HB2685 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Home Birth Safety Act. Provides for the licensure of midwives by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Creates the Illinois Midwifery Board. Sets forth provisions concerning qualifications, grounds for disciplinary action, and administrative procedures. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to set a repeal date for the new Act of January 1, 2024. Also amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987, the Nurse Practice Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to make related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
HOME BIRTH SAFETY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-10-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Remains in Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Health Care Licenses Committee; 000-006-001 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 50-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.34 | New Code | See Bill Text |