IL HB2681 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Professional Services Selection Act. Provides that a political subdivision may waive the public hearing, evaluation procedure, and selection procedure for the selection of architectural, engineering, or land surveying services in an emergency situation for a project that is expected to cost less than $50,000 (currently, $25,000). Provides that this amount shall be increased annually by a percentage equal to the annual unadjusted percentage increase, if any, as determined by the consumer price index-u.
Title
LOCAL GOV PROFESSIONAL SERVICE
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Rep. Steven Andersson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 510 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |