IL HB2674 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Repeals a Section authorizing the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to develop and provide a program of college savings instruments to State residents. Effective immediately.
Title
ISAC-COLLEGE SAVINGS PROG-REP
Sponsors
Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0251 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 75 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |