IL HB2667 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Forcible Entry and Detainer Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that when property is part of a master association or a common interest community association (instead of "subject to the provisions of a declaration establishing a common interest community and requiring the unit owner to pay regular or special assessments for the maintenance or repair of common areas owned in common by all of the owners of the common interest community or by the community association and maintained for the use of the unit owners or of any other expenses of the association lawfully agreed upon") and other specific conditions are met, the board may bring a forcible entry and detainer action. Provides that provisions governing actions to collect common expenses apply to any common interest community association that is subject to the Common Interest Community Association Act. Deletes language providing that the provisions do not apply to any common interest community unless specified conditions are met. Provides that "common interest community" and "common interest community association" have the meanings provided in the Common Interest Community Association Act. Makes other changes.
Title
CIV PRO-COMMON INTEREST ASSOCS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 9-104.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2667&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2667.htm |