IL HB2659 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning the Illinois Solar for All Program. Provides that the Illinois Power Agency shall make every effort to ensure that small and emerging businesses, particularly those located in low-income and environmental justice communities are able to participate in the Illinois Solar for All Program. Makes changes to incentive programs provided for under the Illinois Solar for All Program. Makes changes in provisions concerning legislative declarations and findings; definitions; and general powers and duties of the Agency. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall open an investigation to deliberate, develop, and adopt a renewable energy access plan no later than December 31, 2022. Provides that within 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Commission shall open a proceeding to update the interconnection standards and applicable utility tariffs and establish an interconnection working group. Makes changes in provisions concerning net electricity metering; distributed generation rebate; recovery of costs associated with the provision of delivery and other services; and provisions relating to procurement. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Permits the Illinois Commerce Commission to adopt emergency rules. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-ENERGY EFFICIENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-131 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 8-512 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2659&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2659.htm |