IL HB2659 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes technical changes to specify in provisions concerning provisional eligibility for long-term care services that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall adopt rules. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-EXPEDITED LONG-TERM CARE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0265 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 11-5.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |