IL HB2656 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0439
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, for service transferred from a downstate police pension fund under a specific provision, credits and creditable service shall be granted upon transfer of those credits to IMRF. Specifies that if the board determines that the amount transferred is less than the true cost to the Fund of allowing that creditable service to be established, then in order to establish that creditable service, the member must pay to the Fund an additional contribution equal to the difference, as determined by the board in accordance with the rules and procedures adopted by the Fund. Provides that if the member does not make the full additional payment prior to termination of his participation with that employer, then his or her creditable service shall be reduced by an amount equal to the difference between the amount transferred and the true cost to the Fund of allowing that creditable service to be established, as determined by the board in accordance with the rules and procedures that it adopts. Authorizes the board to establish, by rule, the manner of making these calculations. Effective immediately.
Title
IMRF-TRANSFERRED CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Darlene Senger [R] | Rep. Raymond Poe [R] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] |
Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0439 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2013 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-139 | Amended Code | Citation Text |