IL HB2653 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. Contains provisions concerning the establishment of various programs and services for the benefit of veterans including a proactive outreach program for veterans that served in high casualty units, in units that experienced high conflict areas, and in units where at least one service member committed suicide following his or her service; a public awareness campaign concerning the trauma and internal injuries suffered by veterans; and a licensing program for therapy dogs for veterans. Requires the Department of Veterans' Affairs to adopt any rules necessary to implement these provisions.
Title
VETERANS' SUICIDE TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |