IL HB2642 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Deletes language providing that all provisions of the declaration, bylaws, and other community instruments severed by the Act shall be revised by the board of directors independent of the membership to comply with the Act.
Title
COMMN INT COMM'TY-INSTRUMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0759 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2016 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 160 | 1-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |