IL HB2638 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that a prescriber shall offer a prescription for naloxone hydrochloride or another drug approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration for the complete or partial reversal of opioid depression to a patient when one or more of the following conditions are present: (1) the prescription dosage for the patient is 90 or more morphine milligram equivalents of an opioid medication per day; (2) an opioid medication is prescribed concurrently with a prescription for benzodiazepine; (3) the patient presents with an increased risk for overdose, including a patient with a history of overdose, a patient with a history of substance use disorder, or a patient at risk for returning to a high dose of opioid medication to which the patient is no longer tolerant. Provides other requirements and exemptions. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
OPIOID PRESCRIBER REQUIREMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |