IL HB2635 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Defines "retired law enforcement officer qualified under federal law" for purposes of the Act to permit the carrying of a concealed weapon. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012, the Unified Code of Corrections, and the County Jail Act. Permits currently employed and qualified retired State correctional officers and county correctional officers to carry their own firearms off-duty without being in violation of the unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statutes if they meet certain training requirements. Provides that currently employed and qualified retired State correctional officers and county correctional officers shall carry a photographic identification and a valid annual firearm certificate while carrying their own firearms off-duty. Limited to correctional officers who have custody and control over inmates in an adult correctional facility. Effective immediately.
Title
CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS-FIREARMS
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] | Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] |
Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Michael Marron [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-01-05 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 125 | 26.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |