IL HB2633 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a prisoner may be transferred to a super-maximum security institution only when, within one year of the date of the proposed transfer: (1) while incarcerated, the prisoner committed or attempted to commit acts of violence either: (i) which resulted in serious injury or death or (ii) in connection with any act of non-consensual sex; (2) the prisoner has engaged in 2 or more acts which caused serious disruption of prison operations; or (3) the prisoner has escaped or attempted to escape from within a security perimeter or custody, or both, or direct supervision. Provides that prisoners with serious mental illnesses shall not be transferred to a super-maximum security facility. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall review the status of all prisoners currently housed at a super-maximum security institution within 90 days of the effective date of the amendatory Act to determine whether they should continue to be housed at that facility. Prisoners already incarcerated for longer than one year may continue to be held at a super-maximum institution only on the basis of specified criteria and must be provided a hearing within 6 months of the effective date of the amendatory Act.
Title
CD CORR-SUPERMAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2009-03-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-03-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-03-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-03-18 | Correctional Note Filed | |
2009-03-17 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2009-03-13 | Home Rule Note Filed | |
2009-03-13 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Balanced Budget Note Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Judicial Note Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Standard Debate Prison Reform Committee; 004-003-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-03-10 | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed | |
2009-03-09 | Pension Note Filed | |
2009-03-09 | State Debt Impact Note Filed | |
2009-03-05 | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed | |
2009-03-05 | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-05 | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-05 | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-05 | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-05 | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-05 | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-05 | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-05 | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-05 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-05 | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Prison Reform Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Annazette Collins | |
2009-02-20 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2633&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2633.htm |