IL HB2620 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Provides that a person is eligible for a diaper allowance of $80 per month per child if the person's household income is at or below 50% of the federal poverty guidelines, the person is responsible for the welfare of a child 3 years of age or younger, and the person receives medical assistance under the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the diaper allowance may be used only to purchase diapers and shall be issued through an electronic benefit transfer card. Provides that the diaper allowance is not considered income for purposes of determining eligibility for medical assistance under the Illinois Public Aid Code or for any other public aid benefits provided under State law. Effective October 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-DIAPER ALLOWANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20130510-75New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback