IL HB2609 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Hospital Price Transparency Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a facility (a hospital licensed under the Hospital Licensing Act, organized under the University of Illinois Hospital Act, or licensed under the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act) must make specified information public. Requires facilities to maintain lists of standard charges and shoppable services and ensure that the lists are available at all times to the public. Contains reporting requirements. Requires the Department of Public Health to monitor each facility's compliance with the requirements of the Act and to enforce compliance with the Act. Provides that facilities that violate the Act must submit and implement a corrective action plan. Establishes the Hospital Price Transparency Fund as a special fund in the State treasury and makes a conforming change in the State Finance Act. Requires administrative penalties collected under the Act to be deposited into the Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Department for expenses relating to the implementation, administration, and enforcement of the Act. Contains other provisions. Amends the University of Illinois Hospital Act. Requires the University of Illinois Hospital to comply with the Hospital Price Transparency Act. Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Provides that any report submitted to the Department under the Hospital Price Transparency Act and any information or data contained in such a report is subject to disclosure to the public by the Department. Requires hospitals licensed under the Act to comply with the Hospital Price Transparency Act. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
HOSPITAL PRICE TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
Rep. Jed Davis [R] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Special Issues Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 330 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 85 | 6.14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 9.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.990 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2609&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2609.htm |