IL HB2608 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act. Provides that amounts allocated to the Department of Revenue from the Local Government Distributive Fund for distributions to municipalities and counties are subject to a continuing appropriation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LGDF-CONTINUING APPROP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301152Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback