IL HB2604 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Safe Patient Limits Act. Provides the maximum number of patients that may be assigned to a registered nurse in specified situations. Provides that nothing shall preclude a facility from assigning fewer patients to a registered nurse than the limits provided in Act. Provides that nothing in the Act precludes the use of patient acuity systems consistent with the Nurse Staffing by Patient Acuity Act; however, the maximum patient assignments in the Act may not be exceeded, regardless of the use and application of any patient acuity system. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt rules governing the implementation and operation of the Act. Provides that all facilities shall adopt written policies and procedures for training and orientation of nursing staff and that no registered nurse shall be assigned to a nursing unit or clinical area unless that nurse has, among other things, demonstrated competence in providing care in that area. Provides that the written policies and procedures for the training and orientation of nursing staff shall require that all temporary personnel receive the same amount and type of training and orientation that is required for permanent staff. Provides that the Act's provisions are severable.
Title
SAFE PATIENT LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-02-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-04 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-09-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-07 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-008-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |