IL HB2569 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 036-067-003
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Polygraph Exam Integrity Act. Provides that every polygraph question submitted for the administration of a polygraph exam by a State agency or entity shall be screened by independent legal counsel to ensure compliance with the Illinois Constitution and the United States Constitution and federal and State law. Provides that screenings shall be paid by the entity requesting the service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLYGRAPH EXAMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 36 N: 67 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Lost 036-067-003
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-04-05HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-04-02HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-01HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-04-01HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000
2019-03-27HouseReported Back To Labor & Commerce Committee;
2019-03-27HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Labor & Commerce Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-06HouseTo Job Growth, Preservation and Training Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback