IL HB2561 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. In the case of a college or university meeting certain criteria, for services performed in an instructional, research, or principal administrative capacity, provides that a person is presumed not to have reasonable assurance of employment under an offer that is conditioned on enrollment, funding, or program changes. Provides that: it is the employer's burden to provide sufficient documentation to overcome the presumption; reasonable assurance must be determined on a case-by-case basis by the total weight of the evidence rather than the existence of any one factor; and primary weight must be given to the contingent nature of an offer of employment based on enrollment, funding, and program changes. Provides that a letter from an employer to an employee that makes employment conditional is not prima facie evidence of reasonable assurance to be used to deny a claim for unemployment insurance.
Title
UNEMP INS-REASONABLE ASSURANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Business and Industry Regulations Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 612 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2561&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2561.htm |