IL HB2555 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning board meetings.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 15 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Lost 015-101-000 |
2011-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2011-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2011 |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Wilhelmi |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2011 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-048-000 |
2011-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2011-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 2-1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |