IL HB2552 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Streetgang Terrorism Omnibus Prevention Act. Deletes the definition of "streetgang" or "gang" or "organized gang". Provides instead that "streetgang" or "gang" or "organized gang" or "criminal street gang" means an ongoing group, club, organization, or association of 3 or more persons that has as one of its primary purposes the commission of criminal offenses and the members of which engage, or have engaged within the past 5 years, in a course or pattern of criminal activity.
Title
STREETGANG OMNIBUS-DEFINITIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Tabled |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-30 | House | Motion Discharge Committee Tabled |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-03-15 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 147 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |