IL HB2546 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Code does not apply to the process to procure contracts, or contracts entered into, by the State of Illinois, acting by and through the Department of Natural Resources, with regards to the World Shooting and Recreational Complex in Randolph County, Illinois.
Title
PROCUREMENT CD-APPLICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported Back To State Government Administration Committee; |
2021-03-24 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ State Government Administration Committee; 003-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | To Procurement Subcommitee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |