IL HB2542 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. In a Section concerning the credit for wages paid to ex-felons, provides that, if the taxpayer is a business located in a census tract with a high rate of unemployment and violent crime, then (i) the amount of the credit shall be 10% (currently, 5%) of qualified wages paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year to the qualified ex-offender and (ii) the total credit allowed to that taxpayer with respect to each qualified ex-offender may not exceed $3,000 (currently, $1,500) for all taxable years. Provides that, in the case of those taxpayers, the requirement that the ex-felon must be hired by the taxpayer within 3 years after being released from an Illinois adult correctional center does not apply. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EX-FELON JOBS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 216 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2542&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2542.htm |