IL HB2541 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Gun Dealer Licensing Act. Provides that it is unlawful for a person to engage in the business of selling, leasing, or otherwise transferring firearms without a license issued by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Provides that a dealership agent other than a dealer licensee-in-charge may act on behalf of the licensed dealership without being licensed as a dealer under the Act. Creates the Gun Dealer Licensing Board consisting of 5 members appointed by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation to recommend policies, procedures, and rules relevant to the administration and enforcement of the Act. Provides that the holder of a dealership license issued under the Act may employ in the conduct of his or her business dealership agents. Establishes qualifications for obtaining dealership licenses and for being employed as a dealership agent. Establishes penalties for violations of the Act. Provides for rulemaking, including emergency rulemaking. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Provides that the Act is repealed on January 1, 2028. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes conforming changes.
Title
GUN DEALER LICENSING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-31 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-02-23 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2541&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2541.htm |