IL HB2538 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-24 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regional Planning Act. Requires open meetings of the Board of the Chicago Metropolitan Agency for Planning to be broadcast to the public and maintained in real-time on the Board's website using a high-speed Internet connection. Provides that recordings of each meeting broadcast shall be posted to the Board's website within a reasonable time after the meeting and shall be maintained as public records to the extent practicable, as determined by the Board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CMAP-RECORD AND STREAM MEETING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-24HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-24HouseHouse Concurs
2017-06-24House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 098-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-19HouseArrived in House
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass as Amended Government Reform; 006-000-000
2017-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70170725Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback