IL HB2530 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Requires the corporate authorities of a taxing district that is subject to the Law to adopt a limiting rate by ordinance or resolution if the percentage change in the equalized assessed value of all property within the taxing district during the 12-month calendar year preceding the levy year is less than the percentage change in the Consumer Price Index during that same period of time. Provides that the limiting rate may not exceed the maximum rate permitted under the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law. Contains provisions concerning notice. Provides that the rate extended for the sum of all of the funds included in the taxing district's aggregate extension may not exceed the limiting rate adopted by the taxing district. Effective immediately.
Title
PTELL-DISTRICTS ADOPT RATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-195 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2530&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2530.htm |