IL HB2530 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In a Section allowing the State Board of Education to distribute loan or grant moneys to school districts for temporary relocation expenses, provides that the moneys may be distributed for temporary relocation expenses incurred by school districts as a result of mine subsidence. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
SCH CD-AID-MINE SUBSIDENCE
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Eddy [R] | Rep. Thomas Holbrook [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. Dan Reitz [D] |
Rep. Michael Smith [D] | Rep. Karen Yarbrough [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-29 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0102 | |
2009-07-29 | Effective Date July 29, 2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Governor Approved | |
2009-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-21 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-21 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-003-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Education; 009-001-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Held in Education | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-30 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-26 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |