IL HB2522 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act and the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that nothing in those Acts or their rules shall be interpreted to prohibit the distribution of free drinks on the gaming floor of a riverboat licensed under the Riverboat Gambling Act. Effective immediately.
Title
RIVERBOATS-FREE DRINKS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2522&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2522.htm |