IL HB2505 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0070
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0070
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a temporary guardian shall have the limited powers and duties (instead of "all of the powers and duties") of a guardian of the person or of the estate which are specifically enumerated by court order.
Title
PROBATE-TEMP ADULT GUARDIANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0070 |
2015-07-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11a-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |